Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Puig y Montserrat, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1813Born
23 Dec 183724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
16 Jan 187460.4AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
24 Jan 187561.5Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
2 Jan 189480.4DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Puig y Montserrat
Bishop Juan Antonio Puig y Montserrat O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFelanitx, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 464
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,868, Page 40, Number 8
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,875, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast