Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermín Negrón Santana

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Titular Bishop of Gegi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1937Born
30 May 196931.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 198143.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
30 Jun 198143.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gegi
7 Sep 198143.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gegi
10 Mar 201274.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Hermín Negrón Santana
Bishop Hermín Negrón Santana (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaranjito
Ordained BishopComplejo Deportivo Jose Pepin Cestero, Bayamon

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,489
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast