Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Manso

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460Born
15 Nov 150444.8AppointedBishop of Magua, Dominican Republic
8 Aug 151151.6AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
3 Mar 1512³52.1Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
151353.0InstalledBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
27 Sep 153979.7DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Manso
Bishop Alonso Manso (born 1460, died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBecerril de Campos, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopAsunción de Nuestra Señora, Cathedral, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,048
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 27, Number 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278, and Page 232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1512, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast