Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel María Cerero y Soler

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1847Born
23 Sep 187124.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 190053.2AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
29 Jul 190053.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
27 Sep 190760.6DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel María Cerero y Soler
Bishop Manuel María Cerero y Soler (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan de Puerto Rico

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 510

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast