Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo de Bastidas y Rodriguez de Romera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1531AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
30 Jun 1532Ordained BishopBishop of Coro, Venezuela
6 Jul 1541AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
6 May 1567ResignedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1570¹DiedBishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Bastidas y Rodriguez de Romera
Bishop Rodrigo de Bastidas y Rodriguez de Romera (died 1570) Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Domingo
Ordained BishopCollégiale San Antonio, Medina del Campo, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain

  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 43, Number 214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 329, and Page 278
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1532, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast