Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Rodríguez de Olmedo y Valle

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1771³Born
18 Dec 181544.2AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
4 Aug 181644.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
8 Jul 182452.7SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
21 Mar 182553.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
23 Jan 183159.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Rodríguez de Olmedo y Valle
Archbishop Mariano Rodríguez de Olmedo y Valle (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuancarqui, Peru

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,816, Number 37
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 219, and Page 313
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 134, Number 720

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast