Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco de Padilla y San Martín, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1646Born
1666²19.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
22 May 168336.7SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
15 Nov 168337.2ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1684²37.3Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1 Jun 169952.7AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1700¹53.3DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco de Padilla y San Martín
Bishop Juan Francisco de Padilla y San Martín O. de M. (born , died 1700) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Peru

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 176, and Page 321
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 225, Number 1,397
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast