Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Fernández Torres

Bishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1964 Born
7 Jan 199530.6Ordained PriestPriest of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
14 Feb 200742.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
14 Feb 200742.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufes
21 Apr 200742.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufes
24 Sep 201046.4AppointedBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Daniel Fernández Torres
Bishop Daniel Fernández Torres (born ) Bishop of Arecibo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained BishopSanta Teresita, Church, San Juan, Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Arecibo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,406
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2010
  • c1: CB, 3 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 May 2021

Quantcast