Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe José de Tres-Palacios y Verdeja

Deceased

Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1722BornAvilés, Spain
25 Jun 178462.0AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
5 Dec 178563.5Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
24 Feb 178966.7SelectedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
30 Mar 178966.8ConfirmedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
16 Sep 179977.3DiedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Felipe José de Tres-Palacios y Verdeja:
Bishop Felipe José de Tres-Palacios y Verdeja (born , died ) Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • bd/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,799
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 102, Number 531
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 164, and Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016