Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Martí

Deceased

Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1720BornBrafim, Spain
25 May 176140.4AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
17 Jan 176241.0Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
29 Jan 177049.1AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
20 Feb 179271.1DiedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Mariano Martí:
Bishop Mariano Martí (born , died ) Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 79, Number 395
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345, and Page 437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015