Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar Münster, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia


Events

DateEventTitle
1625Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
13 Feb 1631AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
13 Feb 1631AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
21 Apr 1631Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
4 Feb 1654DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Kaspar Münster
Bishop Kaspar Münster O. Carm. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünstereifel
Ordained BishopCathedral, Osnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück
Death PlaceKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,035

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast