Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubertus Brandenburg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Stockholm, Sweden


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1923Born
20 Dec 195229.0Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
12 Dec 197451.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
12 Dec 197451.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Strathernia
26 Jan 197551.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strathernia
21 Nov 197754.0AppointedBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
17 Nov 199875.0RetiredBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
4 Nov 200985.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Stockholm, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Hubertus Brandenburg
Bishop Hubertus Brandenburg (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Stockholm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück, Germany
Ordained BishopOsnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück, Germany
Death PlaceOsnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück, Germany
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Osnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück, Germany

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,649

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 May 2021

Quantcast