Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Anton Joseph Lüpke

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

Titular Bishop of Anthedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1775³BornBersenbrück
21 Sep 179924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
5 Jul 183054.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
5 Jul 183054.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
28 Oct 183055.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
8 Apr 185579.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Anton Joseph Lüpke:
Bishop Karl Anton Joseph Lüpke (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013