Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernhard von Waldeck

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Osnabrück

Titular See: (Left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1551Born
25 Oct 158534.8SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
18 Aug 158635.6ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
25 May 158837.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Osnabrück, Germany
11 Mar 159140.2DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernhard von Waldeck:
Priest Bernhard von Waldeck (died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Osnabrück

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013