Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franz Wilhelm Cardinal von Wartenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg

Bishop of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1593BornMünich
27 Oct 162532.6SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Jan 162733.9ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
26 Jun 163037.3AppointedBishop of Verden, Germany
1633²39.8AppointedBishop of Minden, Germany
4 Jun 163441.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Nov 163643.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Dec 163643.7Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
9 Nov 164249.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
15 Dec 164249.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
24 Oct 164855.6ResignedBishop of Minden, Germany
24 Oct 164855.6ResignedBishop of Verden, Germany
12 Apr 164956.1SucceededBishop of Regensburg, Germany
5 Apr 166067.0Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 166168.7DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Wilhelm von Wartenberg:
Franz Wilhelm Cardinal von Wartenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
  • a cardinal for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1660
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015