Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Hoya zu Stolzenau

Deceased

Bishop of Münster, Germany

Bishop of Osnabrück

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1529Born
5 Oct 155324.4SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
30 Mar 155424.9ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
26 Oct 156637.5SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
23 Jul 156738.2ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
4 Oct 156738.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 156738.4Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
22 Feb 156838.8SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
6 Nov 156839.5ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
5 Apr 157444.9DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Hoya zu Stolzenau (VIAF: 59894057)
Bishop Johann von Hoya zu Stolzenau (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWiborg
Ordained BishopSainte Croix, Bentlage sur le Rhin
Death PlaceAhaus

  • a priest for 6.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247, and Page 264
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018