Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eitel Friedrich Cardinal von Hohenzollern-Sigmaringen

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1582BornSigmaringen
11 Jan 162138.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 162139.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
19 Apr 162340.6SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
2 Oct 162341.0ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
29 Oct 162341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
19 Sep 162543.0DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Eitel Friedrich von Hohenzollern-Sigmaringen:
Cardinal Eitel Friedrich von Hohenzollern-Sigmaringen (born , died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
  • a cardinal for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 81, Number 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 14, and Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013