Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodor Kettmann

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück

Titular Bishop of Busiris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1938 BornBesten bei Ankum
1 Feb 196425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Nov 197840.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Nov 197840.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Busiris
18 Feb 197940.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Busiris
30 Nov 201173.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Theodor Kettmann:
Bishop Theodor Kettmann (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osnabrück.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014