Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Bischopinck

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613¹BornMünster
31 Mar 164633.2Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
9 Jul 165744.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
9 Jul 165744.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
21 Oct 165744.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
19 Sep 166754.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Bischopinck:
Bishop Johann Bischopinck (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 21.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015