Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Wilhelm von Bronckhorst zu Gronsfeld, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Titular Bishop of Columbica

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1640Born
27 Aug 166222.2ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
167130.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Nov 167636.4IncardinatedPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
2 Jan 169352.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
2 Jan 169352.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Columbica
26 Apr 169352.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Columbica
13 Oct 170262.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
5 Apr 171372.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Otto Wilhelm von Bronckhorst zu Gronsfeld
Bishop Otto Wilhelm von Bronckhorst zu Gronsfeld S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast