Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Ludolf Cardinal Melchers, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Member of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1813BornMünster
14 Apr 184128.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Münster, Germany
5 Jun 184128.4Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
3 Aug 185744.6AppointedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
20 Apr 185845.3Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
8 Jan 186653.0AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
3 Jul 188572.5ResignedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
27 Jul 188572.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jul 188572.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
10 Feb 189279.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
14 Dec 189582.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul Ludolf Melchers:
Cardinal Paul Ludolf Melchers S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 215, and Page 429
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013