Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Schräder

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

Titular Bishop of Scyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1900BornHörstel
18 Dec 192626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
22 Jun 195958.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
22 Jun 195958.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Scyrus
8 Sep 195959.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scyrus
10 Dec 197171.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Schräder:
Bishop Bernhard Schräder (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013