Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Egon von Fürstenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1737BornHerdringen Husten
31 Oct 177033.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Osnabrück, Germany
4 Nov 177033.4Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
7 Mar 178648.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
12 Jun 178649.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
24 Jul 178649.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Jul 178649.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
24 Jul 178649.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
27 Jan 178850.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe
6 Jan 178951.6SucceededBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
6 Jan 178951.6SucceededBishop of Paderborn, Germany
29 May 178952.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
11 Aug 182588.2DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Egon von Fürstenberg
Bishop Franz Egon von Fürstenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/s: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 193, and Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016