Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Heinrich Beckmann

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1803Born
20 Sep 182825.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Osnabrück, Germany
20 Dec 182825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
5 Apr 186662.7SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
22 Jun 186662.9ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
18 Oct 186663.2Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
30 Jul 187875.0DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Heinrich Beckmann (VIAF: 301651322)
Bishop Johannes Heinrich Beckmann (born , died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstercappeln, Diocese of Osnabrück
Ordained BishopCathedral, Osnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 430
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017