Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludwig Averkamp

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hamburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1927BornVelen
10 Oct 195427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
18 Jan 197345.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
18 Jan 197345.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
24 Feb 197346.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thapsus
7 Nov 198558.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
9 Sep 198760.6SucceededBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Sep 198760.6InstalledBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
24 Oct 199467.7AppointedArchbishop of Hamburg, Germany
7 Jan 199567.9InstalledArchbishop of Hamburg, Germany
16 Feb 200275.0RetiredArchbishop of Hamburg, Germany
29 Jul 201386.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hamburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Averkamp:
Archbishop Ludwig Averkamp (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hamburg

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014