Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz von Waldeck

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

Bishop of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491Born
10 Feb 153039.1SelectedBishop of Minden, Germany
18 Jan 153140.0ConfirmedBishop of Minden, Germany
1 Jun 153241.4SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
11 Jun 153241.4SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
16 Aug 153241.6ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
16 Aug 153241.6ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
29 Dec 154049.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jan 154150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
23 Apr 155362.3ResignedBishop of Münster, Germany
15 Jul 155362.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz von Waldeck (VIAF: 40174939)
Bishop Franz von Waldeck (born 1491, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Münster

EventPlace
Ordained BishopConvent, Marienfeld

  • a priest for 12.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247, and Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast