Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Erich von Braunschweig-Grubenhagen

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Osnabrück, Germany

Bishop of Münster

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478¹Born
6 Mar 150830.1SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
6 Sep 150830.6ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
17 Nov 150830.8SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
20 Apr 150931.3ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
27 Mar 153254.2AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
14 May 153254.3DiedBishop-Elect of Osnabrück, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Erich von Braunschweig-Grubenhagen (VIAF: 190954560)
Father Erich von Braunschweig-Grubenhagen (born 1478, died ) Bishop-Elect of Osnabrück

EventPlace
Death PlaceFürstenau

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1508, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast