Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz-Josef Hermann Bode

Bishop of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1951 BornPaderborn
13 Dec 197524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
5 Jun 199140.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
5 Jun 199140.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mattiana
1 Sep 199140.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mattiana
12 Sep 199544.6AppointedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
26 Nov 199544.8InstalledBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz-Josef Hermann Bode:
Bishop Franz-Josef Hermann Bode (born ) Bishop of Osnabrück

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osnabrück.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,466
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014