Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Sartoris de Tremonia (Velmecker, Schneider), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tiflis


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1507AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Apr 1507AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minden, Germany
19 Apr 1507AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiflis
30 May 1507Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiflis
1516¹AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
1518¹ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Mar 1551DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Sartoris de Tremonia (Velmecker, Schneider)
Bishop Johannes Sartoris de Tremonia (Velmecker, Schneider) O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück

  • a bishop for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 310
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1507, Number 34*
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jun 2020

Quantcast