Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Klemens von Gruben

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1764BornBonn
27 Dec 178723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1 Jun 179530.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
1 Jun 179530.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
6 Sep 179530.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
26 Jul 180136.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Dec 182460.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
11 Aug 182560.7AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
4 Jul 182762.6DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Klemens von Gruben:
Bishop Karl Klemens von Gruben (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013