Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Philipp Sigismund von Braunschweig-Lüneburg

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1568Born
5 Jun 159122.9AppointedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
19 Mar 162354.7DiedBishop-Elect of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp Sigismund von Braunschweig-Lüneburg:
Priest Philipp Sigismund von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Osnabrück

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013