Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Heiner Wilmer, S.C.I.

Bishop-Elect of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1961 Born
29 Sep 198221.4First VowsMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
1985²23.7Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
31 May 198726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
25 May 201554.1AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
6 Apr 201856.9AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1 Sep 201857.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heiner Wilmer (VIAF: 64667323)
Father Heiner Wilmer S.C.I. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchapen, Diocese of Osnabrück
Ordained BishopCathedral, Hildesheim, Diocese of Hildesheim

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Hildesheim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast