Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyacinth Petit, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

Titular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1680BornVirton
15 Apr 170222.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
8 Mar 170424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
11 Feb 171838.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
11 Feb 171838.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
11 Feb 171838.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
13 Feb 171838.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
26 Jul 171939.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hyacinth Petit:
Bishop Hyacinth Petit O. Carm. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

  • a priest for 15.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015