Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Alhaus, O.S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aradus

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1716Born
173417.3ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
20 Sep 173822.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
19 Sep 173923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
2 Oct 175842.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
2 Oct 175842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
4 Feb 175942.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradus
3 Sep 176448.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
26 May 179477.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Alhaus
Bishop Wilhelm von Alhaus O.S.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBienburg

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018