Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Hugo von Gäertz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

Titular Bishop of Dorylaëum

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1684BornKoblenz
22 Dec 170824.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
23 Feb 170924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
4 Feb 171530.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
4 Feb 171530.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
15 Feb 171530.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
31 Mar 171530.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
31 Dec 171632.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Hugo von Gäertz:
Bishop Johann Hugo von Gäertz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 7.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 10 Jul 2015