Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Horst Eberlein

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Hamburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tisedi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1950 Born
16 Apr 197726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
9 Feb 201766.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamburg, Germany
9 Feb 201766.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisedi
25 Mar 201766.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisedi

MicroData Summary for Horst Eberlein
Father Horst Eberlein (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Hamburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWalsleben/Altmark
Ordained BishopSankt Marien, Cathedral, Hamburg, Archdiocese of Hamburg

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Hamburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2017
  • ob: CB, 9 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Feb 2017