Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Bernard Höting

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1821Born
6 Jun 184624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
10 Feb 188260.5AppointedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
3 May 188260.7Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
21 Oct 189877.2DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Bernard Höting (VIAF: 301307625)
Bishop Johann Bernard Höting (born , died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGronau, Diocese of Münster
Ordained BishopOsnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 430
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017