Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert Bitter

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sweden

Titular Archbishop of Soltania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1848Born
24 Sep 187426.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 188637.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sweden
23 May 189344.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Doliche
24 Sep 189345.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doliche
9 Oct 192274.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Soltania
9 Oct 192274.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Sweden
19 Dec 192678.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sweden

MicroData Summary for Albert Bitter (VIAF: 300439592)
Archbishop Albert Bitter (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sweden

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelle, Diocese of Hildesheim, Germany
Ordained BishopOsnabrück, Diocese of Osnabrück, Germany

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,893, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast