Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl-August Siegel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück

Titular Bishop of Sinnipsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1916BornLübeck
19 Mar 194730.8Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
12 Dec 197458.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
12 Dec 197458.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinnipsa
26 Jan 197558.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinnipsa
18 Nov 198872.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
8 Oct 199074.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl-August Siegel:
Bishop Karl-August Siegel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013