Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto von Hoya

Deceased

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1392SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
10 Jun 1392ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
4 Oct 1424DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Otto von Hoya:
Bishop Otto von Hoya (died ) Bishop of Münster

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 21 Jan 2016