Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benno (Bernhard)

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1020¹Born
22 Nov 106848.8AppointedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
1 Feb 106949.0Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Jul 108868.5DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benno (Bernhard) (VIAF: 15563142)
Bishop Benno (Bernhard) (born 1020, died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLöhningen
Ordained BishopKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Death PlaceIburg

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: ATh, 17 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017