Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Diepholz

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1424²Born
11 Jun 145531.4SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
15 Dec 145531.9ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 May 145632.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
21 May 148258.3DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Diepholz (VIAF: 80767235)
Bishop Konrad von Diepholz (born 1424, died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a bishop for 25.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,609
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1456, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast