Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Alexandria

Dioecesis Alexandrina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 16 June 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of New Orleans
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Louisiana
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 27,810 (10,741 Square Miles)
  • Description: Rapides, Avoyelles, Concordia, Catahoula, LaSalle, Grant, Natchitoches, Vernon, Tensas, Caldwell, Winn, Franklin, and Madison Parishes (counties).
  • Conference Region: V (AL, KY, LA, MS, TN)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: ALX
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesealex.org/
  • Mailing Address: 4400 Coliseum Boulevard, Alexandria, LA 71303-3513, USA
  • Telephone: (318) 445-6424
  • Fax: 448-6121

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Natchitoches
29 July 1853ErectedArchdiocese of New Orleans Diocese of Natchitoches (erected) (Between 32 and 33 lattitude, from the Mississippi River to the boundaries of Texas)
Diocese of Alexandria
6 August 1910Name ChangedDiocese of Natchitoches Diocese of Alexandria
Diocese of Alexandria-Shreveport
18 October 1976Name ChangedDiocese of Alexandria Diocese of Alexandria-Shreveport
Diocese of Alexandria
16 June 1986SplitDiocese of Alexandria-Shreveport Diocese of Alexandria
Diocese of Shreveport (Caddo, Bossier, Webster, Claiborne, Lincoln, Union, Morehouse, West Carroll, DeSoto, Bienville, Jackson, Ouachita, Richland, Red River, and Sabine)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Alexandria
195052,481900,0005.8%65601254195230595ap1951
195976,920906,7368.5%121571784325741378ap1960
196691,8591,009,8609.1%130561864932735287ap1967
197043,4511,015,8914.3%112531652637127984ap1971
Diocese of Alexandria-Shreveport
197673,5001,083,1326.8%98421405255322185ap1977
198083,4321,130,0007.4%1014214358315522682ap1981
Diocese of Alexandria
199048,050423,40011.3%54156969610196748ap1991
199948,050401,21112.0%661682585636448ap2000
200048,050401,21112.0%591574649185649ap2001
200149,050401,21112.2%5714716905174947ap2002
200247,321392,63912.1%6112736485164948ap2003
200348,050389,97012.3%5712696965164848ap2004
200448,050392,63912.2%6014746495183948ap2005
200648,050388,90312.4%5814726676183948ap2007
201244,600395,60011.3%7113845306173150ap2013
201536,669383,4219.6%61137449518172350ap2016
201835,199367,5799.6%7177845115102050ap2019
202035,968389,6759.2%645695212381650ap2021
202236,804370,8619.9%653685412251550ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Natchitoches
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 175
  • Diocese of Alexandria
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 266
  • Diocese of Alexandria-Shreveport
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 681, and Page 682

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024