Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Paul Morin

Bishop Emeritus of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1941 Born
15 Apr 197130.1Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
11 Feb 200361.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
11 Feb 200361.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
22 Apr 200362.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
2 Mar 200967.9AppointedBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
27 Apr 200968.1InstalledBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
16 Dec 201675.7RetiredBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for Roger Paul Morin
Bishop Roger Paul Morin (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Biloxi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLowell, MA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Biloxi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,366
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast