Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Clement Favalora

Archbishop Emeritus of Miami, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1935 BornNew Orleans
20 Dec 196126.0Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
16 Jun 198650.5AppointedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
29 Jul 198650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
14 Mar 198953.3AppointedBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
16 May 198953.4InstalledBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
3 Nov 199458.9AppointedArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA
20 Dec 199459.0InstalledArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA
20 Apr 201074.4ResignedArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for John Clement Favalora:
Archbishop John Clement Favalora (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Miami

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Miami.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013