Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Napoleon Joseph Perché

Deceased

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1805Born
19 Sep 182924.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 187065.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
8 Feb 187065.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Abdera
1 May 187065.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Abdera
25 May 187065.3SucceededArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
27 Dec 188378.9DiedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Napoleon Joseph Perché
Archbishop Napoleon Joseph Perché (born , died ) Archbishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers, Diocese of Angers, France
Ordained BishopSt. Louis, Cathedral, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69, and Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017