Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Henry Gracida

Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1923 Born
1951²27.5EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1953²29.5Simple VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1956²32.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1958²34.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
23 May 195935.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1961²37.5IncardinatedPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
6 Dec 197148.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
6 Dec 197148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Masuccaba
25 Jan 197248.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Masuccaba
1 Oct 197552.3AppointedBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
6 Nov 197552.4InstalledBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
19 May 198359.9AppointedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
11 Jul 198360.0InstalledBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
1 Apr 199773.8ResignedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René Henry Gracida
Bishop René Henry Gracida (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Orleans, LA, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Miami, Archdiocese of Miami, Florida

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Corpus Christi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 888

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Jul 2020

Quantcast