Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas John Rodi

Archbishop of Mobile, Alabama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1949 BornNew Orleans
20 May 197829.1Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
15 May 200152.1AppointedBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
2 Jul 200152.3Ordained BishopBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
2 Apr 200859.0AppointedArchbishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
6 Jun 200859.2InstalledArchbishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas John Rodi:
Archbishop Thomas John Rodi (born ) Archbishop of Mobile

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mobile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 14,000

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 8 Feb 2014