Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Heslin

Deceased

Bishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1845Born
8 Sep 186923.7Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
29 Mar 188943.2AppointedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
18 Jun 188943.4Ordained BishopBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
22 Feb 191165.1DiedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Heslin
Bishop Thomas Heslin (born , died ) Bishop of Natchez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilloe, Diocese of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Louis, Cathedral, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017