Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregory Michael Aymond

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Alexandria, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1949 Born
10 May 197525.4Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
19 Nov 199647.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
19 Nov 199647.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Acholla
10 Jan 199747.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acholla
2 Jun 200050.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Austin, Texas, USA
3 Aug 200050.7InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Austin, Texas, USA
2 Jan 200151.1SucceededBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
12 Jun 200959.5AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
20 Aug 200959.7InstalledArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
3 Apr 201969.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Gregory Michael Aymond (VIAF: 16678955)
Archbishop Gregory Michael Aymond (born ) Archbishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Cathedral Basilica, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of New Orleans.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,885
  • aadm: CB, 5 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast